This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/17/2022 at 18:04:44 (UTC).

FYP, LLC D/B/A TEXAS PROPERTY TAX LOANS vs. JULIANNE HOERMAN, et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 FYP, LLC D/B/A TEXAS PROPERTY TAX LOANS filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JULIANNE HOERMAN. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0714

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FYP, LLC D/B/A TEXAS PROPERTY TAX LOANS

2221 E Lamar Blvd, Ste 130

Arlington, TX 76006

Defendants

HOERMAN, JULIANNE

Coppell, TX 75019

HOERMAN, JARED

Coppell, TX 75019

CITIGROUP, INC.

1999 Bryan St, Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

CITY OF COPPELL, COPPELL ISD, DALLAS COUNTY, DALLAS COLLEGE, PARKLAND HOSPITAL

Dallas, TX 75202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LESOK, CRAIG C

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: CRAIG LESOK

ISSUE CITATION - CITIGROUP INC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - CITY COPPELL; DALLAS COUNTY

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - JULIANNE HOERMAN

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - JARED HOERMAN

ISSUE CITATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 4-PRIVATE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: CRAIG LESOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FYP, LLC D/B/A TEXAS PROPERTY TAX LOANS : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FYP, LLC D/B/A TEXAS PROPERTY TAX LOANS : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 28316-2022-DCLK; FYP, LLC d/b/a Texas Property Tax Loans $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FYP, LLC D/B/A TEXAS PROPERTY TAX LOANS : Transaction Assessment; ; $382.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: FYP, LLC D/B/A TEXAS PROPERTY TAX LOANS ; Total Financial Assessment $382.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $382.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FYP, LLC, a Texas limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where Citigroup Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig C Lesok