This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/06/2022 at 12:58:29 (UTC).

FROYLAN QUEZADAet al vs. 3M COMPANYet al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 FROYLAN QUEZADA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOYE', ERIC. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7166

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOYE', ERIC

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Quezada, Froylan

Quezada, Quadalupe

Defendants

3M COMPANY

211 E. 7Th St. Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701

AFTON PUMPS, INC.

7335 Avenue North

Houston, TX 77011

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

1999 Bryan St. Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY)

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION f/k/a COOPER CAMERON CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to THE COOPER-BESSEMER CORPORATION)

CHEVRON USA, INC.

211 E. 7Th Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701

ANCO INSULATIONS, INC.

83730, Baton

Rouge, LA 70884-3730

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

1999 Bryan St. Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.

211 E. 7Th St. Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA INC.

1999 Bryan St. Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. f/k/a AQUA-CHEM, INC. d/b/a CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

CRANE CO.

1999 Bryan St. Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPNAY f/k/a STERLING CHEMICALS

E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY

1999 Bryan St. Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

ELLIOTT COMPANY f/k/a and d/b/a ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY

ETHYL CORPORATION

1999 Bryuan St. Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

211 E. 7Th Street, Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION f/k/a THE DURIRON COMPANY, INC. (sued as successor-by-merger to DURCO INTERNATIONAL)

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDOWELL, DARREN

Other Attorneys

PRAZAK, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

EXECUTED CITATION - SANTA FE BRAUN INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - SANTA FE BRAUN INC

EXECUTED CITATION - TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION

EXECUTED SOS CITATION - THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY

EXECUTED CITATION - THE LUBRIZOL CORPORATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE LUBRIZOL CORPORATION

EXECUTED CITATION - THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

EXECUTED CITATION - THE CHEMOURS COMPANY

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE CHEMOURS COMPANY

EXECUTED SOS CITATION - TEXACO, INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - TEXACO, INC.

EXECUTED CITATION - SHELL OIL COMPANY

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - SHELL OIL COMPANY

EXECUTED SOS CITATION - SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.

ISSUE CITATION - CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - BAYER CROPSCIENCE, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - AFTON PUMPS, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - 3M COMPANY

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

198 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - SANTA FE BRAUN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE LUBRIZOL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - THE CHEMOURS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - TEXACO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - SHELL OIL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - ROHM AND HAAS TEXAS INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13/TAG-ALONG CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for QUEZADA, FROYLAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 78831-2021-DCLK; Quezada, Froylan $724.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for QUEZADA, FROYLAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $724.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: QUEZADA, FROYLAN ; Total Financial Assessment $751.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $751.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AFTON PUMPS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLEAVER BROOKS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethyl Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ANCO INSULATION INC is a litigant