This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/30/2022 at 06:42:33 (UTC).

FREMONT EMERGENCY SERVICES ( MANDAVIA), LTD, et al vs. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC, et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 FREMONT EMERGENCY SERVICES MANDAVIA , LTD filed an Other lawsuit against UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6246

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES LTD.

FREMONT EMERGENCY SERVICES ( MANDAVIA), LTD

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

TEAM PHYSCIANS OF NEVADA-MANDAVIA P.C.

STEFANKO, CRUM

RUBY CREST EMERGENCY MEDICINE

Defendants

UNITED HEALTH CARE SERVICES, INC

UMR, INC

UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC

UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY

UNITEDHEALTHCARE

UNITED MEDICAL RESOURCES

OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, INC

SIERRA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

SIERRA HEALTH-CARE OPTIONS, INC

HEALTH PLAN OF NEVADA INC.

EDWARDS, MARK

Dallas, TX 75231

DOES 1-10

ROE ENTITIES 11-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORD, SAMMY, IV

 

Court Documents

DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Judgment Type; DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; HEALTH PLAN OF NEVADA INC.; Awarded Against:; JONES LTD.

EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - MARK EDWARDS

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - MARK EDWARDS

ORDER ON PETITION FOR MISCELLANEOUS ACTION FOR APPLICATION FOR WITNESS SUBPOENA

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER ON PETITION FOR MISCELLANEOUS ACTION FOR APPLICATION FOR WITNESS SUBPOENA

NO ACTIVITY LETTER

Final Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

MOTION MISCELLANOUS

MOTION - MISCELLANOUS

MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION - QUASH; Comment: AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

ORDER ON PETITION FOR MISCELLANEOUS ACTION FOR APPLICATION FOR WITNESS SUBPOENA

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER ON PETITION FOR MISCELLANEOUS ACTION FOR APPLICATION FOR WITNESS SUBPOENA

NO ACTIVITY LETTER

Final Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED; Comment: MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Judgment Type: DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; HEALTH PLAN OF NEVADA INC.: Awarded Against:; JONES LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - QUASH; Comment: AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - MARK EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FREMONT EMERGENCY SERVICES ( MANDAVIA), LTD : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 31103-2021-DCLK; FREMONT EMERGENCY SERVICES ( MANDAVIA), LTD $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FREMONT EMERGENCY SERVICES ( MANDAVIA), LTD : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketISSUE SUBPOENA; Comment: WAITING ON SIGNED ORDER AND DOCUMENT TO SIGN AND SEAL NEEDS TO BE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER ON PETITION FOR MISCELLANEOUS ACTION FOR APPLICATION FOR WITNESS SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FREMONT EMERGENCY SERVICES ( MANDAVIA), LTD : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 30880-2021-DCLK; FREMONT EMERGENCY SERVICES $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FREMONT EMERGENCY SERVICES ( MANDAVIA), LTD : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: FREMONT EMERGENCY SERVICES ( MANDAVIA), LTD ; Total Financial Assessment $300.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED MEDICAL RESOURCES is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITEDHEALTHCARE is a litigant