This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/08/2023 at 09:16:29 (UTC).

FRANKLIN RIVERO, et al vs. RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 FRANKLIN RIVERO, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC ,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SLAUGHTER, GENA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0226

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SLAUGHTER, GENA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RIVERO, FRANKLIN

ZAMBRANO, MONICA

Defendants

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC.

3 Executive Park Dr 9

Bedford, NH 03110

STOKES, WILLIE

Memphis, TN 38141

AMS ENTERPRISES, LLC

495 Brook Ridge Cir

Cordova, TN 38018

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUDSON, JAMES R.

Defendant Attorney

BYRNE, RICHARD J

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION - WILLIE ANTHONY STOKES

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

EXECUTED CITATION - RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC

RYDER'S JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

RYDER'S ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

1ST AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: 1ST

EXECUTED CITATION - WILLIE STOKES

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - WILLIE STOKES

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

ISSUE CITATION-AMS ENTERPRISES, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: AMS ENTERPRISES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for RIVERO, FRANKLIN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 6822-2023-DCLK; RIVERO, FRANKLIN $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for RIVERO, FRANKLIN : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - WILLIE STOKES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: 1ST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 4820-2023-DCLK; RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC. $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $10.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/19/2023; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 01/30/2023: Comment; WILLIE ANTHONY STOKES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 01/17/2023; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF STATE: Returned; 01/23/2023: Comment; RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for RIVERO, FRANKLIN : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for RIVERO, FRANKLIN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 1158-2023-DCLK; RIVERO, FRANKLIN $229.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for RIVERO, FRANKLIN : Transaction Assessment; ; $366.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: RIVERO, FRANKLIN ; Total Financial Assessment $374.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $374.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less