This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 07/05/2022 at 19:31:41 (UTC).

FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY vs. AINOW TECHNOLOGIES LLC

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AINOW TECHNOLOGIES LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOORE, MARICELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4658

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOORE, MARICELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

AINOW TECHNOLOGIES LLC

9900 Spectrum Drive

Austin, TX 78717

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY, IAN A.

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION - AINOW TECHNOLOGIES LLC

ISSUE CITATION

EXECUTED CITATION - AINOW TECHNOLOGIES LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - AINOW TECHNOLOGIES LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - AINOW TECHNOLOGIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 05/31/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 06/27/2022: Comment; AINOW TECHNOLOGIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 27421-2022-DCLK; FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY $221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Mercury Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian A McCarthy