This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/15/2022 at 09:08:02 (UTC).

FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. vs. EISINGER SMITH, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EISINGER SMITH, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WYSOCKI, ASHLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5957

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WYSOCKI, ASHLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.

3965 Airways Blvd, Module G, 3Rd Floor

Memphis, TN 38116

Defendant

EISINGER SMITH, LLC

4433 Lorraine Avenue

Dallas, TX 75205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUFFY, CRAIG J

Defendant Attorney

GAMEROS, CHARLES W, Jr.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

EXECUTED CITATION - EISINGER SMITH, LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - EISINGER SMITH, LLC

COUNTERCLAIM AND ORIGINAL ANSWER

COUNTER CLAIM

ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF

ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF

LETTER TO COURT CASE SETTLED

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER TO COURT CASE SETTLED

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.; Awarded Against:; EISINGER SMITH, LLC

LETTER RE: MOTION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: MOTION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL

MOTION FOR MUTUAL DISMISSAL

MOTION - DISMISS; Comment: MUTUAL

PROPOSED ORDER OF MUTUAL DISMISSAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF MUTUAL DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY ORDER TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.: Awarded Against:; EISINGER SMITH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketREACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF MUTUAL DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS; Comment: MUTUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: MOTION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketSCHEDULING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketScheduling Conference; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE SETTLED; Comment: SETTLED PER 8/9 EMAIL FROM D ATTY, ASKED TO FILE SETTLEMENT LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketINACTIVATE CASE (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER TO COURT CASE SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 07/14/2022; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 07/18/2022: Comment; EISINGER SMITH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 34185-2022-DCLK; FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. $221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GAMEROS, CHARLES W, Jr.