This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 06/28/2022 at 17:51:53 (UTC).

ESTATE OF WINCELL AUNEEN DUHON

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 ESTATE OF WINCELL AUNEEN DUHON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********86-1

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Decedents

DUHON , WINCELL AUNEEN

DUHON, PAT

DUHON, WINCELL LEASURE

Applicant

NEAL, TRACIE DIANN

Carrollton, TX 75006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MIMS, LISABETH ANN

 

Court Documents

Application Probate Will.Letters Testamentary.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

Will.Wincell Pat Duhon.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

WILL

WILL; Comment: WILL DATED: 02/04/2002 DOD 03/17/2022 AGE: 87

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

Posted Notice - Application to Probate Will

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN:6/13/22

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 05/31/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 06/01/2022; Comment: RTN: 6/1/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN:6/13/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL; Comment: WILL DATED: 02/04/2002 DOD 03/17/2022 AGE: 87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for NEAL, TRACIE DIANN : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for NEAL, TRACIE DIANN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-08418; NEAL, TRACIE DIANN $251.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for NEAL, TRACIE DIANN : Transaction Assessment; ; $388.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: NEAL, TRACIE DIANN ; Total Financial Assessment $388.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $388.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisabeth A Mims