This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 07/05/2022 at 21:03:35 (UTC).

ESTATE OF WAVERLY EUGENE STEWART

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 ESTATE OF WAVERLY EUGENE STEWART was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********00-1

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Decedent

STEWART , WAVERLY EUGENE

Applicant

STEWART, CARLYLE ANDERSON

Plano, TX 75093

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MIMS, LISABETH ANN

 

Court Documents

Application Probate Will.Letters Testamentary.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

Will.WES 05.25.2010.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: WITH ORIGINAL WILL

WILL

WILL; Comment: DOD:01/14/2021 AGE:61 WILL DATED:05/25/2010

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

Posted Notice - Application to Probate Will

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 6/13/22

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

Dallas Co.Proposed Hearing Docs.ltr.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS FOR COURT HEARING

Order Admit.Will.Letters.Testamentary.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS FOR COURT HEARING

Oath of Executor.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS FOR COURT HEARING

Proof of Death.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS FOR COURT HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Judicial Officer: THOMPSON, BRENDA H; Hearing Time: 10:40 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS FOR COURT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 06/01/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 06/02/2022; Comment: RTN: 6/2/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 6/13/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL; Comment: DOD:01/14/2021 AGE:61 WILL DATED:05/25/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: WITH ORIGINAL WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, CARLYLE ANDERSON : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, CARLYLE ANDERSON : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-08539; STEWART, CARLYLE ANDERSON $251.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, CARLYLE ANDERSON : Transaction Assessment; ; $388.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: STEWART, CARLYLE ANDERSON ; Total Financial Assessment $388.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $388.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisabeth A Mims