This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/02/2022 at 12:00:57 (UTC).

ESTATE OF SANDRA LEIGH MCQUEEN

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 ESTATE OF SANDRA LEIGH MCQUEEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********86-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Decedent

MCQUEEN, SANDRA LEIGH

Applicant

MCFARLAND, STEVEN GLENN

Robinson, TX 76706

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

BERRYMAN, SARAH M

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory.Signed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF INVENTORY

Notice to Creditors.pdf

NOTICE

Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory.Signed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF INVENTORY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

OATH FILED

OATH FILED

Notice to Creditors.pdf

NOTICE

McQueen.Affidavit of Compliance.pdf

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE.SANDRA LEIGH MCQUEEN

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

McQueen.Affidavit of Compliance.pdf

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE.SANDRA LEIGH MCQUEEN

308 Reminder Letter New CT#1

NTC TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL REMINDER LETTER

Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory.Signed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF INVENTORY

Notice to Creditors.pdf

NOTICE

2021.04.20 Efile.Request for Letters.MCQUEEN.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: MCQUEEN, SANDRA LEIGH - REQUEST FOR LETTERS

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

OATH FILED

OATH FILED

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE.SANDRA LEIGH MCQUEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL REMINDER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MCFARLAND, STEVEN GLENN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-07224; MCFARLAND, STEVEN GLENN $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MCFARLAND, STEVEN GLENN : Transaction Assessment; ; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: MCQUEEN, SANDRA LEIGH - REQUEST FOR LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 02/02/2021; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 02/03/2021; Comment: RTN: 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 2/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketWILL; Comment: WILL DATED 5/20/1996 DOD 10/28/2020 AGE 72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER SUBMITTING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MCFARLAND, STEVEN GLENN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-01583; MCFARLAND, STEVEN GLENN $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MCFARLAND, STEVEN GLENN : Transaction Assessment; ; $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: MCFARLAND, STEVEN GLENN ; Total Financial Assessment $278.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $278.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION TO PROBATE WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY.MCQUEEN, SANDRA LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less