This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/10/2022 at 14:47:42 (UTC).

ESTATE OF NORA T. COLLINS

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 ESTATE OF NORA T COLLINS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********38-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Decedent

COLLINS, NORA T.

Coppell, TX 75019

Applicant

COLLINS, RICHARD S.

Coppell, TX 75019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

BUTRUS, CAROL WILLIS

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: - OF TOUFIC TAKESH

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: - OF PAM TAKESH

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

JUDGMENT DECLARING HEIRSHIP

JUDGMENT DECLARING HEIRSHIP

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES; Comment: - IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND SECREED THAT THIS APPOINTMENT IS HEREBY TERMINATED AND LINDA L. WILANS IS DISCHARGED AS ATTORNEY AD LITEM IN THIS CAUSE

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

Waiver of De Novo Hearing-signed.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF DE NOVO HEARING PURSUANT TO 54A.216 OF THE TEXAS GOVERNMENT CODE

Proposed Order.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS

Statement of Facts - Toufic.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS

Collins - Ltr to clerk re cert copy of judgment.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES

JUDGMENT DECLARING HEIRSHIP

JUDGMENT DECLARING HEIRSHIP

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: - OF TOUFIC TAKESH

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: - OF PAM TAKESH

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES; Comment: - IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND SECREED THAT THIS APPOINTMENT IS HEREBY TERMINATED AND LINDA L. WILANS IS DISCHARGED AS ATTORNEY AD LITEM IN THIS CAUSE

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES

Waiver of De Novo Hearing-signed.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF DE NOVO HEARING PURSUANT TO 54A.216 OF THE TEXAS GOVERNMENT CODE

Proposed Order.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLLINS, RICHARD S. : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # PR-2022-06083; COLLINS, RICHARD S. $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLLINS, RICHARD S. : Transaction Assessment; ; $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLLINS, RICHARD S. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-03762; COLLINS, RICHARD S. $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLLINS, RICHARD S. : Transaction Assessment; ; $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT DECLARING HEIRSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLLINS, RICHARD S. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-02367; COLLINS, RICHARD S. $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLLINS, RICHARD S. : Transaction Assessment; ; $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: - OF TOUFIC TAKESH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: - OF PAM TAKESH

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: OCA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Served: 02/08/2021; Anticipated Server: OTHER SERVER; Anticipated Method: CIT BY PUBLICATION; Actual Server: OTHER SERVER; Returned: 04/19/2021; Comment: RTN: 4/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 02/04/2021; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 02/05/2021; Comment: RTN: 02/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 2/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLLINS, RICHARD S. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-01816; COLLINS, RICHARD S. $335.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLLINS, RICHARD S. : Transaction Assessment; ; $335.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: COLLINS, RICHARD S. ; Total Financial Assessment $447.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $447.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION TO DETERMINE HEIRSHIP AND FOR INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION AND LETTERS OF INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carol W Butrus