This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/03/2022 at 11:23:17 (UTC).

ESTATE OF MARY LILLIAN STEWART

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 ESTATE OF MARY LILLIAN STEWART was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********27-1

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Decedent

STEWART, MARY LILLIAN

Dallas, TX 75231

Applicants

FILLMORE, JOHN STEWART

Tyler, TX 75703

FILLMORE, STEWART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

NOWLIN, JERRY L

 

Court Documents

Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory.signed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF INVENTORY

Posted Notice - Application to Probate Will

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 5/24/21

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

Waiver of De Novo.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF DE NOVO HEARING

OATH FILED

OATH FILED

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

Request for Letters.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR LETTERS

will.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION TO PROBATE COPY OF WILL AND FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

Fillmore; Proof of Death.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS FOR COURT HEARING

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory.signed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF INVENTORY

Fillmore; Certificate of Compliance.signed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL

Fillmore; Publishers Affidavit.Notice to Creditors.pdf

NOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT

Request for Letters.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR LETTERS

OATH FILED

OATH FILED

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

PROOF BY SUBSCRIBING WITNESS

PROOF BY SUBSCRIBING WITNESS; Comment: - LISA MILLER ("AFIANT")

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FILLMORE, JOHN STEWART : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-13141; FILLMORE, JOHN STEWART $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FILLMORE, JOHN STEWART : Transaction Assessment; ; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF BY SUBSCRIBING WITNESS; Comment: - LISA MILLER ("AFIANT")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL; Comment: WILL DATED: 8-18-2017 DOD: 3-30-2021 AGE: 83

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 05/17/2021; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 05/18/2021; Comment: RTN: 5/18/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 5/24/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FILLMORE, JOHN STEWART : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-08548; FILLMORE, JOHN STEWART $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FILLMORE, JOHN STEWART : Transaction Assessment; ; $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: FILLMORE, JOHN STEWART ; Total Financial Assessment $276.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $276.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION TO PROBATE COPY OF WILL AND FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less