This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/11/2022 at 19:58:05 (UTC).

ESTATE OF MARK HANSON

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 ESTATE OF MARK HANSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WARREN, INGRID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********23-2

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WARREN, INGRID

 

Party Details

Decedent

HANSON, MARK

Applicant

HANSON, COLE WILLIAM

Burlington, VT 05401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MORRIS, ROBERT SMITH

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

210923 Ltr to Clerk Requesting Ltrs of Admin.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR LETTERS OF INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION

WILL

WILL; Comment: WILL DATED: 9-23-2004 DOD: 3-26-2021 AGE: 70

Posted Notice - Application to Probate Will

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 7/12/21

210819 Ltr to Clerk Enclosing Proposed Documents for Proveup Hearing .pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS

Distributee's Consent To Application for Independent Admin

WAIVER; Comment: DISTRIBUTEE'S CONSENT TO APPLICATION FOR INDEPENDENT ADMIN

210910 Waiver and Renunciation of Right to Letters Testamentary - Outman.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER AND RENUNCIATION OF RIGHT TO LETTERS TESTAMENTARY - OUTMAN

210902 - Waiver of Notice - Natalie Hanson.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE-NATALIE HANSON

Waiver of Notice Sophia Hanson.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE SOPHIE HANSON

ORDER - APPROVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

ORDER - APPROVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

220311 Ltr Enclosing Proposed Order Approving Inventory .pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING INVENTORY

220311 Proposed Order Approving Inventory, Appraisement and List of Claims - Hanson.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING INVENTORY

1 Inventory Reminder Letter (Mark)

INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT REMINDER

220106 Cert of Compliance - Hanson.pdf

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL

211228 Publisher's Affidavit - Hanson.pdf

NOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT

Oath.pdf

OATH FILED

210923 Ltr to Clerk Requesting Ltrs of Admin.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: REQUEST FOR LETTERS OF INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPROVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HANSON, COLE WILLIAM : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-04799; HANSON, COLE WILLIAM $29.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for HANSON, COLE WILLIAM : Transaction Assessment; ; $29.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT - AFTER 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT REMINDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HANSON, COLE WILLIAM : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-18117; HANSON, COLE WILLIAM $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 7/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HANSON, COLE WILLIAM : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-11563; HANSON, COLE WILLIAM $24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HANSON, COLE WILLIAM : Transaction Assessment; ; $24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL; Comment: WILL DATED: 9-23-2004 DOD: 3-26-2021 AGE: 70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HANSON, COLE WILLIAM : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-11292; HANSON, COLE WILLIAM $242.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for HANSON, COLE WILLIAM : Transaction Assessment; ; $242.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: HANSON, COLE WILLIAM ; Total Financial Assessment $317.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION TO PROBATE WILL AND FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED PURSUANT TO SECTION 401.002(B) OF THE TEXAS ESTATES CODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert S. Morris