This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 11/11/2022 at 15:04:05 (UTC).

ESTATE OF LUCIA HOOKS

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 ESTATE OF LUCIA HOOKS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Court located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MONROE, LINCOLN and WARREN, INGRID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********06-2

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MONROE, LINCOLN

WARREN, INGRID

 

Party Details

Decedent

HOOKS, LUCIA

Applicant

FOX, SYLVIA

Springs, TX 75482

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

STEWART, JOHN ALAN

 

Court Documents

Last Will and Testament of Lucia Hooks

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

Application for Probate of Will and Issuance of Le

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

WILL

WILL; Comment: DOD: 10/16/2021 AGE:98 WILL DATE:07/18/2012

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

ORDER - APPROVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

ORDER - APPROVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

certificateattorney

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL

2 Notice to Beneficiaries Reminder Letter (Mark)

NTC TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL REMINDER LETTER

noticecreditorshooks

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

orderIA

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

Proof Addendum Qualifications

PROOF (GENERAL); Comment: PROOF ADDENDUM QUALIFICATIONS

Oath of Executor

OATH FILED; Comment: SYLVIA FOX

Proof of Death and Other Facts

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS; Comment: SYLVIA FOX

Proof Addendum Qualifications

PROOF (GENERAL); Comment: PROOF ADDENDUM QUALIFICATION

Order Admitting Will to Probate and Authorizing Is

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

Posted Notice - Application to Probate Will

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 12/27/2021

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPROVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL REMINDER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT - BEFORE 90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, JOHN ALAN : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # PR-2022-06523; STEWART, JOHN $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, JOHN ALAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: STEWART, JOHN ALAN ; Total Financial Assessment $8.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 12/13/2021; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 12/14/2021; Comment: RTN:12/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 12/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL; Comment: DOD: 10/16/2021 AGE:98 WILL DATE:07/18/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FOX, SYLVIA : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-21869; FOX, SYLVIA $266.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for FOX, SYLVIA : Transaction Assessment; ; $266.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: FOX, SYLVIA ; Total Financial Assessment $268.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $268.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEWART, JOHN ALAN