This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/19/2022 at 03:23:21 (UTC).

ESTATE OF JOSEPH ARNOLD PAULIN

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 ESTATE OF JOSEPH ARNOLD PAULIN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********24-1

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Decedent

PAULIN, JOSEPH ARNOLD

Applicant

PAULIN, LINDA DEMPSEY

Garland, TX 75044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

BLACKWELL, RONALD O

 

Court Documents

Posted Notice - Application to Probate Will

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 8/16/21

paulin oath signed.pdf

OATH FILED

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

Abstract Probate Action- Guardianship- sig-RC

Abstract Probate Action- Guardianship- sig-RC

paulin compliance signed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 308.001-309.004 AND SECTION 308.0015 TEXAS ESTATE CODE

WILL

WILL; Comment: DOD: 10/07/2020 AGE: 72 WILL DATED: 09/28/2020

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

WILL

WILL; Comment: DOD: 10/07/2020 AGE: 72 WILL DATED: 09/28/2020

ORDER - FILE INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

ORDER - FILE INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

Abstract Probate Action- Guardianship- sig-RC

Abstract Probate Action- Guardianship- sig-RC

I&A Reminder New

INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT REMINDER

paulin compliance signed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 308.001-309.004 AND SECTION 308.0015 TEXAS ESTATE CODE

paulin handwritting signed.pdf

PROOF OF DECEDENTS HANDWRITING AND SIGNATURE; Comment: PROOF OF DECENDENT'S HANDWRITTING AND SIGNATURE

paulin oath signed.pdf

OATH FILED

paulin proof of death signed.pdf

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FILE INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT REMINDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 308.001-309.004 AND SECTION 308.0015 TEXAS ESTATE CODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PAULIN, LINDA DEMPSEY : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # PR-2021-18922; BLACKWELL, RONALD O $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PAULIN, LINDA DEMPSEY : Transaction Assessment; ; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF DECEDENTS HANDWRITING AND SIGNATURE; Comment: PROOF OF DECENDENT'S HANDWRITTING AND SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Judicial Officer: THOMPSON, BRENDA H; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Judicial Officer: THOMPSON, BRENDA H; Hearing Time: 01:40 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL; Comment: DOD: 10/07/2020 AGE: 72 WILL DATED: 09/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 08/03/2021; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 08/06/2021; Comment: RTN: 8/6/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 8/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PAULIN, LINDA DEMPSEY : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-13368; PAULIN, LINDA DEMPSEY $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PAULIN, LINDA DEMPSEY : Transaction Assessment; ; $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: PAULIN, LINDA DEMPSEY ; Total Financial Assessment $286.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $286.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION TO PROBATE WILL AND FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLACKWELL, RONALD O