This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/02/2022 at 09:23:40 (UTC).

ESTATE OF JANIE PEARL CHAPMAN

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 ESTATE OF JANIE PEARL CHAPMAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are WARREN, INGRID and MONROE, LINCOLN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********99-2

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

WARREN, INGRID

MONROE, LINCOLN

 

Party Details

Applicant

MOTLEY, TONNIE C.

Prairie, TX 75051

Decedent

CHAPMAN, JANIE PEARL

Prairie, TX 75051

 

Court Documents

Affidavit in Lieu of Iinventory, signed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF INVENTORY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

Wiaver, Randy.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE-RANDY FAIN CHAPMAN

Oath, signed.pdf

OATH FILED; Comment: TONNIE C. MOTLEY

Order Probating Will and for Letters Testamentary - 401#66.doc.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS

Waiver, Connie.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE-CONNIE C. RUDOLPH

Proof of Death, signed.pdf

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS; Comment: Proof of death

Certificate of compliance, singed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL; Comment: -CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

Affidavit in Lieu of Iinventory, signed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF INVENTORY

Certificate of compliance, singed.pdf

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL; Comment: -CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE

Wiaver, Randy.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE-RANDY FAIN CHAPMAN

Waiver, Danny.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE-DANNY FAIN CHAPMAN

Waiver, Connie.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE-CONNIE C. RUDOLPH

Proof Addendum, signed.pdf

PROOF (GENERAL); Comment: PROOF ADDENDUM QUALIFICATIONS

Proof of Death, signed.pdf

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS; Comment: Proof of death

Oath, signed.pdf

OATH FILED; Comment: TONNIE C. MOTLEY

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL; Comment: -CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE-RANDY FAIN CHAPMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE-DANNY FAIN CHAPMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE-CONNIE C. RUDOLPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MOTLEY, TONNIE C. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-10905; MOTLEY, TONNIE C. $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MOTLEY, TONNIE C. : Transaction Assessment; ; $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF (GENERAL); Comment: PROOF ADDENDUM QUALIFICATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS; Comment: Proof of death

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH FILED; Comment: TONNIE C. MOTLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL; Comment: WILL DATED 7/13/1983 DOD 12/5/2020 AGE 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER SUBMITTIGN WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 01/20/2021; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 01/21/2021; Comment: RTN:1/21/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 2/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MOTLEY, TONNIE C. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-00771; MOTLEY, TONNIE C. $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MOTLEY, TONNIE C. : Transaction Assessment; ; $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: MOTLEY, TONNIE C. ; Total Financial Assessment $280.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $280.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less