This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/23/2022 at 18:20:02 (UTC).

ESTATE OF GEORGE H. CARMAN

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 ESTATE OF GEORGE H CARMAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********35-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Applicant

VAN TASSEL, MARY CARMAN

Dayton, OH 45429

Decedent

CARMAN, GEORGE H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

COPLEY, EDWARD A

 

Court Documents

Amended Inventory - EA George Carman (2022).pdf

APPLICATION -AMENDED; Comment: AMENDED INVENTORY, APPRAISEMENT AND LIST OF CLAIMS

ORDER - FILE PROPER INVENTORY

ORDER - FILE PROPER INVENTORY

Publisher's Affidavit - Notice to Creditors - EA George Carman.pdf

NOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT - EA GEORGE CARMAN

I&A Reminder New

I&A Reminder New

I&A Correction Letter

INVENTORY CORRECTION LETTER

Attorneys Certificate - EA George Carman .pdf

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL

Order Approving Inventory - EA George Carman (2021) .pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING INVENTORY

I&A Reminder New

INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT REMINDER

308 Reminder Letter New CT#1

NTC TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL REMINDER LETTER

I&A Reminder New

I&A Reminder New

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

Amended Inventory - EA George Carman (2022).pdf

APPLICATION -AMENDED; Comment: AMENDED INVENTORY, APPRAISEMENT AND LIST OF CLAIMS

ORDER - FILE PROPER INVENTORY

ORDER - FILE PROPER INVENTORY

Publisher's Affidavit - Notice to Creditors - EA George Carman.pdf

NOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT - EA GEORGE CARMAN

I&A Correction Letter

INVENTORY CORRECTION LETTER

Attorneys Certificate - EA George Carman .pdf

AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL

Order Approving Inventory - EA George Carman (2021) .pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING INVENTORY

I&A Reminder New

INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT REMINDER

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION -AMENDED; Comment: AMENDED INVENTORY, APPRAISEMENT AND LIST OF CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FILE PROPER INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT - EA GEORGE CARMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINVENTORY CORRECTION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO BENEFICIARIES AFTER PROBATE OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for VAN TASSEL, MARY CARMAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-20968; VAN TASSEL, MARY CARMAN $29.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for VAN TASSEL, MARY CARMAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $29.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT - AFTER 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT REMINDER

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL; Comment: WILL DATED 9/7/2005 DOD 9/21/2020 AGE 91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: LETTER SUBMITTING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 03/02/2021; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 03/03/2021; Comment: RTN: 03/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 3/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for VAN TASSEL, MARY CARMAN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-02999; VAN TASSEL, MARY CARMAN $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for VAN TASSEL, MARY CARMAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: VAN TASSEL, MARY CARMAN ; Total Financial Assessment $307.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $307.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COPLEY, EDWARD A