This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/11/2022 at 01:32:39 (UTC).

ESTATE OF DARRELL GOODEN

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 ESTATE OF DARRELL GOODEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********96-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Applicant

GOODEN, DARRELL DEWAYNE

Dallas, TX 75233

Decedent

GOODEN, DARRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

POLK, JAMES E

 

Court Documents

GOODEN DARRELL-Notice of Hearing on Application for Declaration of Heirship.pdf

NOTICE - HEARING / FIAT; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR DECLARATION OF HEIRSHIP

GOODEN DARRELL-Statements of Facts for Marion Gooden.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: STATEMENT OF FACTS FOR MARION GOODEN FOR APLLICATION FOR DECLARATION OF HEIRSHIP

GOODEN DARRELL-Statement of Facts for James Gooden.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: STATEMENT OF FACTS FOR JAMES GOODEN

GOODEN DARRELL-Oath of Administrators.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSSED DOCUMENTS FOR COURT HEARING

RETURN PUBLISHED CITATION

RETURN PUBLISHED CITATION; Comment: OCA

GOODEN DARRELL-Order Authorizing Letters of Administration.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSSED DOCUMENTS FOR COURT HEARING

GOODEN DARRELL-Proof of Death and Other Facts.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSSED DOCUMENTS FOR COURT HEARING

Original Answer of Attorney Ad Litem for Unknown Heirs.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

GOODEN DARRELL-Returned Publication.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: ATTORNEY'S CITATION BY PUBLICATION

GOODEN DARRELL-Judgment Declaring Heirship.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED JUDGMENT DECLARING HEIRSHIP

GOODEN DARRELL-Order Authorizing Letters of Administration.pdf

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER AUTHORIZING LETTER OF ADMINISTRATION

Waiver of De Novo Hearing.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF DE NOVO HEARING PURSUANT TO 54A.216(g) OF THE TEXAS GOVERNMENT CODE

GOODEN DARRELL-Waiver of De Novo Hearing.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF DE NOVO HEARING PURSUANT 54A.216(g) OF TEXAS GOVERNMENT CODE

GOODEN DARRELL-Attorney Certificate of Comliance.pdf

CERTIFICATE - ATTORNEY; Comment: ATTORNEY CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH NOTICE REQUIREMENTS UNDER TEXAS ESTATE CODE

GOODEN DARRELL-Notice of Hearing on Application for Declaration of Heirship.pdf

NOTICE - HEARING / FIAT; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR DECLARATION OF HEIRSHIP

GOODEN DARRELL-Statements of Facts for Marion Gooden.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: STATEMENT OF FACTS FOR MARION GOODEN FOR APLLICATION FOR DECLARATION OF HEIRSHIP

GOODEN DARRELL-Statement of Facts for James Gooden.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: STATEMENT OF FACTS FOR JAMES GOODEN

Original Answer of Attorney Ad Litem for Unknown Heirs.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Judicial Officer: THOMPSON, BRENDA H; Hearing Time: 02:15 PM; Comment: & Application for Declaration of Heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED JUDGMENT DECLARING HEIRSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER AUTHORIZING LETTER OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF DE NOVO HEARING PURSUANT TO 54A.216(g) OF THE TEXAS GOVERNMENT CODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF DE NOVO HEARING PURSUANT 54A.216(g) OF TEXAS GOVERNMENT CODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - ATTORNEY; Comment: ATTORNEY CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH NOTICE REQUIREMENTS UNDER TEXAS ESTATE CODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - HEARING / FIAT; Comment: NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR DECLARATION OF HEIRSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: STATEMENT OF FACTS FOR MARION GOODEN FOR APLLICATION FOR DECLARATION OF HEIRSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: STATEMENT OF FACTS FOR JAMES GOODEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 05/06/2021; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 05/07/2021; Comment: RTN:5/7/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 5/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GOODEN, DARRELL DEWAYNE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-07843; GOODEN, DARRELL DEWAYNE $24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GOODEN, DARRELL DEWAYNE : Transaction Assessment; ; $24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GOODEN, DARRELL DEWAYNE : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2021-05386; GOODEN, DARRELL DEWAYNE $242.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GOODEN, DARRELL DEWAYNE : Transaction Assessment; ; $242.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: GOODEN, DARRELL DEWAYNE ; Total Financial Assessment $335.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $335.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: ADMNISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLK, JAMES E