This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 09/28/2022 at 09:01:57 (UTC).

ESTATE OF ALMA RUTH STEWART

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 ESTATE OF ALMA RUTH STEWART was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Court located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are SHEHAN, TOMI and JOHNSON, MARGARET JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********03-3

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

JOHNSON, MARGARET JONES

SHEHAN, TOMI

 

Party Details

Decedent

STEWART, ALMA RUTH

Applicant

STEWART, JOHN A.

Lancaster, TX 75146

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

STEWART, JOHN ALAN

 

Court Documents

Last Will and Testament of Alma Ruth Stewart

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMNETARY

Application for Probate of Will and Issuance of Le

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMNETARY

WILL

WILL; Comment: ORIGINAL WILL DATED: 03/19/2014 DOD: 03/19/2022 AGE: 98

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

Posted Notice - Application to Probate Will

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 6/6/22

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

orderadmitting

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS

oathexecutor

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS

proofdeath

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS

letter to Court

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

ORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

PROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

othsigned

OATH FILED; Comment: JOHN STEWART

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, JOHN ALAN : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # PR-2022-14161; STEWART, JOHN ALAN $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, JOHN ALAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: STEWART, JOHN ALAN ; Total Financial Assessment $20.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH FILED; Comment: JOHN STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF DEATH AND OTHER FACTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Judicial Officer: SHEHAN, TOMI; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: PROPOSED DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; CONSTABLE: Comment; RTN:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 6/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, JOHN A. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-08198; STEWART, JOHN A. $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, JOHN A. : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, JOHN A. : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, JOHN A. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-06226; STEWART, JOHN A. $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for STEWART, JOHN A. : Transaction Assessment; ; $382.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: STEWART, JOHN A. ; Total Financial Assessment $390.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $390.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL; Comment: ORIGINAL WILL DATED: 03/19/2014 DOD: 03/19/2022 AGE: 98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMNETARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEWART, JOHN ALAN