This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 08/01/2022 at 20:30:35 (UTC).

ESTATE OF ALAN SHUST

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 ESTATE OF ALAN SHUST was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Court located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, BRENDA H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********12-1

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, BRENDA H

 

Party Details

Decedent

SHUST, ALAN

Applicant

SHUST, DAVID

Dallas, TX 75205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

DAVIDSON, MATHEW L

 

Court Documents

Shust - Application For Probate of Will as Muniment of Title.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AS A MUNIMENT OF TITLE

Shust - Original Will.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AS A MUNIMENT OF TITLE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: WITH ORIGINAL WILL

WILL

WILL; Comment: DOD:03/01/2022 AGE:68 WILL DATED: 08/24/2014

PROBATE CASE LABEL

PROBATE CASE LABEL

Posted Notice - Application to Probate Will

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 7/18/2022

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 07/05/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 07/06/2022; Comment: RTN: 7/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 7/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL; Comment: DOD:03/01/2022 AGE:68 WILL DATED: 08/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: WITH ORIGINAL WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SHUST, DAVID : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SHUST, DAVID : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # PR-2022-10298; SHUST, DAVID $253.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SHUST, DAVID : Transaction Assessment; ; $390.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SHUST, DAVID ; Total Financial Assessment $390.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $390.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AS A MUNIMENT OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew L Davidson