This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/13/2023 at 19:06:07 (UTC).

ERLINDA DIZON DAVIN, et al vs. HOME DEPOT U.S.A, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 ERLINDA DIZON DAVIN, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A, INC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1400

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON

ERLINDA DIZON DAVIN,IND., AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE

Defendant

HOME DEPOT U.S.A, INC.

211 East 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin,, TX 78701-3218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORSMAN, WADE ARNOLD

Defendant Attorneys

FARRAR, CHAD L

STECKLEIN, CHARLES B

HARRISON, KATIE P

SHAHRESTANI, ALYSSA

 

Court Documents

WRONGFUL DEATH PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

PLAINTIFFS JURY DEMAND

JURY DEMAND

REQUEST FOR CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

ISSUE CITATION-HOME DEPOT USA INC

ISSUE CITATION

EXECUTED CITATION - HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

DEFENDANT S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type; ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; HOME DEPOT U.S.A, INC.; Awarded Against:; DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON, et al

ORIGINAL ANSWER

- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: LEVEL 2

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2024
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Initial Trial Setting (Level 2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; HOME DEPOT U.S.A, INC.: Awarded Against:; DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON, et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Comment: DEFENDANT S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: LEVEL 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket- GENERAL DENIAL; ORIGINAL ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 02/09/2023; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 02/14/2023: Comment; HOME DEPOT USA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 7717-2023-DCLK; DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 7141-2023-DCLK; DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON : Transaction Assessment; ; $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 6616-2023-DCLK; DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON $213.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: DAVIN, ERLINDA DIZON ; Total Financial Assessment $368.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $368.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less