This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/01/2022 at 13:53:36 (UTC).

EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. vs. FROST BANK

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 EQUIPMENTSHARE COM, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against FROST BANK. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MOYE', ERIC and SLAUGHTER, GENA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7211

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MOYE', ERIC

SLAUGHTER, GENA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC.

Defendant

FROST BANK

111 West Houston Street, San

Antonio, TX 78205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLACE, RICHARD J, III

 

Court Documents

APP FOR POST-JUDGMENT WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

Cover Sheet (General)

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY PARTIES LISTED IN ORDER

Cover Sheet (General)

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY PARTIES LISTED IN ORDER

EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - FROST BANK

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - FROST BANK

PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

ISSUE NOTICE - LUIS SANCHEZ

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

ISSUE WRIT NOTICE - DELTA EXCAVATION AND CONCRETE LLC

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - FROST BANK

ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

APP FOR POST-JUDGMENT WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

ORDER - NONSUIT-FROST BANK

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; SLAUGHTER, GENA; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC.; Awarded Against:; FROST BANK

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY PARTIES LISTED IN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: SLAUGHTER, GENA; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC.: Awarded Against:; FROST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - FROST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: LUIS SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: DELTA EXCAVATION AND CONCRETE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Served: 12/20/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 12/28/2021: Comment; FROST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 79497-2021-DCLK; EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. $316.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $316.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $316.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $316.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equipmentshare.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Frost Bank is a litigant