This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/22/2022 at 02:26:28 (UTC).

EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. vs. BECKHAM CONTRACTING INC. , et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 EQUIPMENTSHARE COM, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BECKHAM CONTRACTING INC . This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, STACI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6750

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, STACI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC.

500 N Akard St Ste 2700, N/A

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendants

BECKHAM CONTRACTING INC.

4285 N. Shilo Drive, Ste. F & L

Fayetteville, AR 72703

BECKHAM, HOUSTON

Lowell, AR 75745-6001

BCI BUILDERS

THE BECK GROUP

THE BECK GROUP HEAVY CIVIL CONTRACTORS

BECKHAM CONTRACTING INC. DBA BCI BUILDERS AND DBA THE BECK GROUP AND DBA THE BEC

1007 North Drive, N/A

Alma, AR 72921

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLACE, RICHARD J, III

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED PETITION.pdf

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: THIRD AMENDED PETITION

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: RETURN OF SERVICE AND REQUEST FOR PROPER FEES AND INFORMATION

RETURN OF SERVICE - BECKHAM CONTRACTING INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SECRETARY OF STATE OF TEXAS - BECKHAM CONTRACTING INC

RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE RE: CASE SET FOR DISMISSAL - HOUSTON BECKHAM

ISSUE CITATION - HOUSTON BECKHAM

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED PETITION

SECOND AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: SECOND AMENDED PETITION

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SECRETARY OF STATE - BECKHAM CONTRACTING INC

RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE SET FOR DISMISSAL - HOUSTON BECKHAM

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

101st Dismissal Letter - 2017

DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 29937-2022-DCLK; EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: THIRD AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: RE: RETURN OF SERVICE AND REQUEST FOR PROPER FEES AND INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Judicial Officer: WILLIAMS, STACI; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SECRETARY OF STATE OF TEXAS - BECKHAM CONTRACTING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Comment: NOTICE RE: CASE SET FOR DISMISSAL - HOUSTON BECKHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: HOUSTON BECKHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 20775-2022-DCLK; EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: HOUSTON BECKHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: BECKHAM CONTRACTING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 77000-2021-DCLK; EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $308.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: EQUIPMENTSHARE.COM, INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $344.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $344.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H. C. BECK PARTNERS, LTD. AKA H.C. BECK, LTD AKA THE BECK GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Equipmentshare.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLACE, RICHARD J, III