This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 15:09:24 (UTC).

EPIC AVIATION, LLC vs. PARAGON TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 EPIC AVIATION, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PARAGON TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE, MCFARLIN, SHERYL and WYSOCKI, ASHLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0906

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE

MCFARLIN, SHERYL

WYSOCKI, ASHLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EPIC AVIATION, LLC

777 Main Street, Ste 2700

Worth, TX 76102

Defendants

PARAGON TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT LLC

2 Medical Plaza, Glen

Cove, NY 11542-2108

PARAGON 441 LLC

2 Medical Plaza, Glen

Cove, NY 11542-2108

N541PJ LLC

2 Medical Plaza, Glen

Cove, NY 11542-2108

N620PJ LLC

2 Medical Plaza, Glen

Cove, NY 11542-2108

PARAGON 358 LLC

2 Medical Plaza, Glen

Cove, NY 11542-2108

MANUFACTURERS AND TRADERS TRUST CO.

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

BOCA AIRCRAFTMAINTENANCE, LLC

3300 Airport Road, Hangar-2, Suite 121, Boca

Raton, FL 33431

GAMA AVIATION ENGINEERING, INC.

7511 Lemmon Avenue, Hangar C

Dallas, TX 75209

LEGACY 1131, LLC

2 Medical Plaza, Glen

Cove, NY 11542-2108

AALL AVIATION, LLC

1004 Nw 100Th Avenue, Pembroke

Pines, FL 33024

WORLD FUEL SERVICES, INC.

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BETTINGER, NICHOLAS SCOT

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

MOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE - TO FILE; LETTER

AMENDED PETITION - FIRST

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: FIRST

MAILED COPY ORDER TO NICHOLAS SCOT BETTINGER

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY ORDER TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER TO DISMISS

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER TO DISMISS

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; EPIC AVIATION, LLC; Awarded Against:; PARAGON TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT LLC, et al

MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION - DISMISS

EXECUTED SOS CITATION - PARAGON 358 LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - PARAGON 358 LLC

EXECUTED SOS CITATION - PARAGON 441 LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - PARAGON 441 LLC

ISSUE CITATION - PARAGON TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT LLC

ISSUE CITATION - PARAGON TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT LLC

MAILED COPY ORDER TO NICHOLAS SCOT BETTINGER

NOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY ORDER TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER TO DISMISS

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION - DISMISS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

MOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

EXECUTED SOS CITATION - PARAGON 358 LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - PARAGON 358 LLC

EXECUTED SOS CITATION - PARAGON 441 LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - PARAGON 441 LLC

EXECUTED SOS CITATION - N620PJ LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - N620PJ LLC

EXECUTED SOS CITATION - N541PJ LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - N541PJ LLC

132 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COPY ORDER TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER; Judgment: Total Judgment:; of $0.00: Awarded To:; EPIC AVIATION, LLC: Awarded Against:; PARAGON TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT LLC, et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2022
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: SEE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - MISCELLANOUS; Comment: EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: WYSOCKI, ASHLEY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: SET BY JUDGE, SEE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - PARAGON 358 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - PARAGON 441 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - N620PJ LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EPIC AVIATION, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 4670-2021-DCLK; EPIC AVIATION, LLC $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EPIC AVIATION, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EPIC AVIATION, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 4621-2021-DCLK; EPIC AVIATION, LLC $672.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EPIC AVIATION, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $672.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: EPIC AVIATION, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $1,556.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $1,556.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAMA AVIATION ENGINEERING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WORLD FUEL SERVICES INC BY SERVING: C T CORPORATION SYSTEM REGISTERED is a litigant

Latest cases where BOCA AIRCRAFT MAINTENANCE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MANUFACTURERS AND TRADERS TRUST COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION ON BEHALF OF HOLDERS OF THE CONTIMORTGAGE HOME DIVISION ETC is a litigant