This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/03/2022 at 06:34:20 (UTC).

EMF PANTHER ISLAND, LLC vs. WNC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 EMF PANTHER ISLAND, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against WNC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITMORE, BRIDGETT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8222

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

WHITMORE, BRIDGETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMF PANTHER ISLAND, LLC

Defendants

BRIT INSURANCE SERVICES USA, INC.

3200

Chicago, IL 60606

WNC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

750 Seventh Avenue, New

York, NY 10019-6829

HIGHLAND INSURANCE SOLUTIONS LLC

750 Seventh Avenue, New

York, TX 10019-6829

PRECISE ADJUSTMENTS, INC.

750 Seventh Avenue, New

York, NY 10019-6829

TOKIO MARINE KILN SYNDICATE 1880

750 Seventh Avenue, New

York, NY 10019-6829

TOKIO MARINE KILN SYNDICATE 510

750 Seventh Avenue, New

York, NY 10019-6829

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON

750 Seventh Avenue, New

York, NY 10019-6829

AMRISC, LLC

750 Seventh Avenue, New

York, NY 10019-6829

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER AMR-62452

750 Seventh Avenue, New

York, NY 10019-6829

INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

1209 Orange St.

Wilmington, DE 19801

QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA

199 Water Street, New

York, NY 10038-3526

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

99 High Street

Boston, MA 02110

SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1832 Schuetz Road, St.

Louis, MO 63146

INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF HANNOVER SE

WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY

289 S. Culver St.

Lawrenceville, GA 30046-4805

CRC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

211 E. 7Th St., Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701-3136

BRIT GLOBAL SPECIALTY USA

BRIT SYNDICATES LIMITED

3200

Chicago, IL 60606

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARANJPE, TEJ

Defendant Attorneys

CHAPANERI, CHRISTOPHER K

ENGLAND, JUSTIN

SHANES, SCOTT ALLEN

COOK, ANDREA E.

Other Attorneys

VESEL, KIRSTEN D

 

Court Documents

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT AND MOTION TO RECONSIDER ABATEMENT

OBJECTION; Comment: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT AND MOTION TO RECONSIDER ABATEMENT

PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER ON MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT

MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT

MOTION - LIFT ABATEMENT

ISSUE CITATION - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER AMR-62452

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - AMRISC, LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER CSN002623

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - TOKIO MARINE KILN SYNDICATE 510

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - TOKIO MARINE KILN SYNDICATE 1880

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - PRECISE ADJUSTMENTS, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - HIGHLAND INSURANCE SOLUTIONS LLC

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION - WNC INSURANCE SERVICE, INC.

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

228 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ABATE; Comment: LIFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: 30M ON MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT SET BY KATE 832-667-7700 VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION HEARING; Judicial Officer: WHITMORE, BRIDGETT; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY JUDGE; Comment: 30M ON MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT SET BY KATE 832-667-7700 VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: ADDITIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Comment: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT AND MOTION TO RECONSIDER ABATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: ON MOTION TO LIFT ABATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 07/06/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF STATE: Returned; 07/09/2021: Comment; WNC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EMF PANTHER ISLAND, LLC : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 40979-2021-DCLK; EMF PANTHER ISLAND, LLC $508.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for EMF PANTHER ISLAND, LLC : Transaction Assessment; ; $508.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: EMF PANTHER ISLAND, LLC ; Total Financial Assessment $516.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $516.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - TO FILE; LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIT GLOBAL SPECIALTY USA is a litigant

Latest cases where CRC INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER AMR-62452 is a litigant