This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 08/12/2022 at 01:01:41 (UTC).

EMEARL DVONN FLETCHER, ELIZABETH MERCADO vs. CITY OF DALLAS

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 EMEARL DVONN FLETCHER, ELIZABETH MERCADO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF DALLAS. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BENSON, D'METRIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********07-A

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BENSON, D'METRIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLETCHER, EMEARL DVONN

MERCADO, ELIZABETH

Defendant

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SERCELY, MATTHEW D

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 63928762

SPECIAL EXCEPTION

SPECIAL EXCEPTION; Comment: AND ORIGINAL ANSWER

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVED CITY OF DALLAS, 4/28/22 AT 2:59 PM

OBJECTIONS

OBJECTION; Comment: TO RULE 193.7 DESIGNATION

DESIGNATIONS EXPERT WITNESS

DESIGNATION - EXPERT WITNESS; Comment: PLAINTIFF S EXPERT DESIGNATIONS

CORRESPONDENCE LETTER TO FILE

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS

NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS; Comment: ELIZABETH MERCADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVITS; Comment: EMEARL FLETCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION - EXPERT WITNESS; Comment: PLAINTIFF S EXPERT DESIGNATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Comment: TO RULE 193.7 DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: SERVED CITY OF DALLAS, 4/28/22 AT 2:59 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSPECIAL EXCEPTION; Comment: AND ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FLETCHER, EMEARL DVONN : STATE CREDIT; ; $137.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FLETCHER, EMEARL DVONN : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2022-03790; FLETCHER, EMEARL DVONN $221.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for FLETCHER, EMEARL DVONN : Transaction Assessment; ; $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: FLETCHER, EMEARL DVONN ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 04/28/20222:59 PM; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 05/04/2022 8:02 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: E-SERVE ENV# 63928762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Sercely