This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 07/04/2022 at 00:14:22 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF SETH ELLIS

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 GUARDIANSHIP OF SETH ELLIS was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Probate Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, MARGARET JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********38-3

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, MARGARET JONES

 

Party Details

Applicants

ELLIS, KENDALL DANE

Carrollton, TX 75006

ELLIS, CHESNA MICHAELE

Carrollton, TX 75006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr.

 

Court Documents

ELLIS.APP.pdf

APPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIANS OF THE PERSON

ELLIS.WAIVER.pdf

WAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING-SADIE HOPE ELLIS

ORDER.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

Posted Notice - Application for Letters of Guardianship

ISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 6/27/22

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

RETURN POSTED NOTICE

JBCC.CHESNA.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - CHESNA

JBCC.KENDALL.pdf

MISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - KENDALL

RETURN PERSONAL CITATION

RETURN PERSONAL CITATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN PERSONAL CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN POSTED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Served: 06/15/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 4; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 4; Returned: 06/16/2022; Comment: RTN: 6-16-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • DocketPOSTED NOTICE; Served: 06/13/2022; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: CONSTABLE; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 1; Returned: 06/14/2022; Comment: RTN:06/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE POSTED NOTICES; Comment: COURT RTN: 6/27/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - KENDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: JBCC CERTIFICATE - CHESNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC. EVENT; Comment: ORDER AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO PROTECTED INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # PR-2022-09524; O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. : Transaction Assessment; ; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: O'CONNOR, RICHARD D., Jr. ; Total Financial Assessment $25.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: WAIVER OF NOTICE BY SIBLING-SADIE HOPE ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMEDICAL REPORT OR LETTER; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MEDICAL EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIANS OF THE PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard D. O'Connor