This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 04/29/2022 at 16:14:05 (UTC).

EDWARD VIERA, MARIA VIERA vs. IRVING HOLDINGS, INC., YELLOW CHECKER CAB COMPANY OF DALLAS/FORT WORTH, INC., OMAR H. QASIM

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 EDWARD VIERA, MARIA VIERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IRVING HOLDINGS, INC , YELLOW CHECKER CAB COMPANY OF DALLAS/FORT WORTH, INC , OMAR H QASIM. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********36-C

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VIERA, MARIA

VIERA, EDWARD

Defendants

QASIM, OMAR H.

Hurst, TX 76053

IRVING HOLDINGS, INC.

2515 Irving Blvd.

Dallas, TX 75207

YELLOW CHECKER CAB COMPANY OF DALLAS

YELLOW CHECKER CAB COMPANY OF DALLAS/FORT WORTH, INC.

2515 Irving Blvd.

Dallas, TX 75207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOHUSLAV, MONICA I.

Defendant Attorney

SCOTT, GREGORY ALAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - APPOINTING MEDIATOR

ORDER - APPOINTING MEDIATOR

ORDER - SCHEDULING

ORDER - SCHEDULING; Comment: UNIFORM(LEVEL 1)

RETURN OF SERVICE - YELLOW CHECKER CAB

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: YELLOW CHECKER CAB

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE - HEARING; Comment: MOTION TO QUASH

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER & COUNTER-CLAIM

COUNTERCLAIM; Comment: DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER & COUNTER-CLAIM

RETURN OF SERVICE - IRVING HOLDINGS, INC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: IRVING HOLDINGS INC

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

3 CCL#3 JURY TRIAL NOTICE

JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

ORDER - APPOINTING MEDIATOR

ORDER - APPOINTING MEDIATOR

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE - HEARING; Comment: MOTION TO QUASH

ORDER - SCHEDULING

ORDER - SCHEDULING; Comment: UNIFORM(LEVEL 1)

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE - HEARING; Comment: MOTION TO QUASH

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketMOTION - QUASH; Original Type: MOTION - QUASH; Judicial Officer: MONTGOMERY, SALLY; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: HEARING HELD; Comment: SET W/CLAUDIA - 214-984-4883 - COURTCALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - HEARING; Comment: MOTION TO QUASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SCHEDULING; Comment: UNIFORM(LEVEL 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - HEARING; Comment: MOTION TO QUASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION - QUASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVTS OF BILLING RECORDS; Comment: AND MEDICAL RECORDS AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: OMAR QASIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: YELLOW CHECKER CAB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: IRVING HOLDINGS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 05/03/202110:26 AM; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 05/05/2021 1:16 PM: Served; 05/03/202110:26 AM: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Returned: 05/05/2021 1:18 PM; Served: 05/06/202112:32 PM; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 05/10/2021 1:50 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for VIERA, EDWARD : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2021-03983; VIERA, EDWARD $289.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for VIERA, EDWARD : Transaction Assessment; ; $289.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: VIERA, EDWARD ; Total Financial Assessment $289.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $289.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: ESERVE 52831293

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YELLOW CHECKER CAB COMPANY OF DALLAS/FORT WORTH,INC., is a litigant

Latest cases where IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, GREGORY ALAN