This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 10:11:15 (UTC).

DONALD B PRICE vs. NORMAN QUINTERO

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 DONALD B PRICE filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against NORMAN QUINTERO. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MOYE', ERIC. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2785

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MOYE', ERIC

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRICE, DONALD B

Defendant

QUINTERO, NORMAN

Perris, CA 92570

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY, JOHN MATTHEW "MATT"

Defendant Attorney

HOWARD, ANDREW V

 

Court Documents

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: LVL 2

NOTICE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: AND LVL 2 S/O MAILED

ORIGINAL ANSWER - NORMAN QUINTERO

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

FP FILE DESK JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

ORDER - REMAND (POST JUDG MOTION) (OCA and REOPEN CASE)

ORDER - REMAND (POST JUDG MOTION) (OCA and REOPEN CASE)

MISCELLANOUS EVENT

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: CIVIL DOCKET

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; MOYE', ERIC; Judgment Type; ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Judgment; Total Judgment:; of $0.00; Awarded To:; QUINTERO, NORMAN; Awarded Against:; PRICE, DONALD B

PROPOSED ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

EXECUTED CITATION - NORMAN QUINTERO

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - NORMAN QUINTERO

OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

OBJECTION; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL/ REQUEST TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY HEARING DATE

RESPONSE; Comment: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL/ REQUEST TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY HEARING DATE

NOTICE OF HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: MOTION TO COMPEL

CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT'S MOTION COMPEL DISCOVERY

MOTION - COMPEL; Comment: DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: LVL 2

NOTICE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: AND LVL 2 S/O MAILED

ORIGINAL ANSWER - NORMAN QUINTERO

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

FP FILE DESK JURY DEMAND FORM

JURY DEMAND

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: MOYE', ERIC; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Compel; Judicial Officer: MOYE', ERIC; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Comment: ***VIA ZOOM***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL/ REQUEST TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY HEARING DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO COMPEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNOTE - CLERKS; Comment: COURTESY COPIES RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: MOTION TO COMPEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Compel; Judicial Officer: MOYE', ERIC; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY JUDGE; Comment: 214-878-2203 ANDREW / CC REQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - COMPEL; Comment: DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PRICE, DONALD B : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 15571-2021-DCLK; PRICE, DONALD B $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PRICE, DONALD B : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PRICE, DONALD B : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 13104-2021-DCLK; PRICE, DONALD B $292.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for PRICE, DONALD B : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: PRICE, DONALD B ; Total Financial Assessment $300.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less