This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/23/2022 at 20:30:41 (UTC).

DANIEL ALEJANDRO GALLEGOS-BANDA vs. DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT, et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 DANIEL ALEJANDRO GALLEGOS-BANDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are PARKER, TONYA and PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7991

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

PARKER, TONYA, PARKER, TONYA

PARKER, TONYA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALLEGOS-BANDA, DANIEL ALEJANDRO

Defendants

DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT

1401 Pacific Ave.

Dallas, TX 75202

IRVING HOLDINGS, INC.

2515 Irving Blvd

Dallas, TX 75207

IGWE, LOVEDAY DAYO

Lancaster, TX 75146

YELLOW CAB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ, RAMON EDUARDO

Defendant Attorney

HOUSE, JOHN HOWELL

 

Court Documents

ISSUE CITATION - DALLAS ARER RAPID TRANSIT

ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

DEFENDANT IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. S ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

REQUEST FOR ISSUE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

DEFENDANT LOVEDAY DAYO IGWE S ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

EXECUTED CITATION - DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON DEFENDANT LOVEDAY DAYO IGWE

MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: ON DEFENDANT LOVEDAY DAYO IGWE

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS

ISSUE CITATION- LOVEDAY DAYO IGWE

ISSUE CITATION

CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT LOVEDAY DAYO IGWE S FIRST CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. D/B/A YELLOW CAB S FIRST CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

MOTION TO QUASH

MOTION - QUASH

SCHEDULING ORDER

SCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: LEVEL 2

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS

DEFENDANT IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. S ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

DEFENDANT LOVEDAY DAYO IGWE S ORIGINAL ANSWER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

EXECUTED CITATION - LOVEDAY DAYO IGWE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - LOVEDAY DAYO IGWE

ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: DEF - LOVEDAY DAYO IGWE

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: PARKER, TONYA; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT LOVEDAY DAYO IGWE S FIRST CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. D/B/A YELLOW CAB S FIRST CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY; Comment: DEFENDANT DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT S SECOND CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - QUASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER; Comment: LEVEL 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNOTE - ADMINISTRATOR; Comment: COURTS SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED 11-22-2021. COPY ALL & MEDIATOR. ORIG/CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S 1ST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 07/06/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 07/08/2021: Comment; DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GALLEGOS-BANDA, DANIEL ALEJANDRO : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 40035-2021-DCLK; GALLEGOS-BANDA, DANIEL ALEJANDRO $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for GALLEGOS-BANDA, DANIEL ALEJANDRO : Transaction Assessment; ; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: GALLEGOS-BANDA, DANIEL ALEJANDRO ; Total Financial Assessment $332.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $332.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IRVING HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS AREA RAPID TRANSIT is a litigant

Latest cases where YELLOW CAB CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN HOWELL HOUSE