This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/19/2022 at 17:23:14 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. VERSA LEE JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against VERSA LEE JOHNSON. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1103

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

JOHNSON, VERSA LEE

LEWIS, DOROTHY VERNELL

Desoto, TX 75115-6662

ARNICK, CONSTANCE O.

Grove, CA 95624-3715

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

RAY, RYAN E.

 

Court Documents

REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2 -SOS & 1 TJRC

DOROTHY VERNELL ;LEWIS - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

CONSTANCE O. ARNICK - SOS CITATION

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

NONSIGNED ORDER APPT ATTY AD-LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

AFFIDAVIT CBP- VERSA LEE JOHNSON

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - VERSA LEE JOHNSON

CBP - VERSA LEE JOHNSON

ISSUE CITATION

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: RYAN RAY (AAL)

AFFIDAVIT FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

EXECUTED CITATION - CONSTANCE O ARNICK

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - CONSTANCE O ARNICK

ORIGINAL ANSWER -GENERAL DENIAL

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

AFFIDAVIT - REPORT OF ATTY AD-LITEM

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: REPORT OF ATTY AD-LITEM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: REPORT OF ATTY AD-LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - CONSTANCE O ARNICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: RYAN RAY (AAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JOHNSON, VERSA LEE : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 - CBP - JJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG; Served: 08/10/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 M/A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 TJRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2 -SOS & 1 TJRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JOHNSON, VERSA LEE : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: JOHNSON, VERSA LEE ; Total Financial Assessment $378.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant