This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/04/2022 at 19:10:56 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. T. A. ISOM A/K/A TRAVIS ADRON ISOM SR. et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against T A ISOM A/K/A TRAVIS ADRON ISOM SR. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1052

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

ISOM, T. A.

ISOM, WAYLAND DARWIN

ISOM, OTHELLA

Murchison, TX 75778

ISOM, TRAVIS ADRON, II

Dallas, TX 75253

ISOM, RODRICK DAMON

Dallas, TX 75253

ISOM, DARRYL LAWAYNE

Murchison, TX 75778

PRICE, SHARON DIJON

Longview, TX 75605

DAVIS, DAWNA ELIZABETH

Dallas, TX 75253

ISOM, WAYLAND THOMAS

Seagoville, TX 75159

ISOM, DOTTIE MICHELE

Garland, TX 75042

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

T. A. ISOM A/K/A TRAVIS ADRON ISOM SR.

OTHELLA ISOM A/K/A OTHELLA ELIZABETH ISOM

439 Dogwood Drive

Murchison, TX 75778

TRAVIS ADRON ISOM II, A/K/A TRAVIS ADRON HALLETT

3721 Middlefield Street

Dallas, TX 75253

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

SUTHERLAND, MARK W

 

Court Documents

CBP- T.A. ISOM AND WAYLAND DARWIN ISOM

ISSUE CITATION

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: SUTHERLAND (AAL)

AFFIDAVIT CBP- WAYLAND DARWIN ISOM

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- WAYLAND DARWIN ISOM

AFFIDAVIT CBP- T.A. ISOM

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP T.A. ISOM

NONSIGNED ORDER - APPT ATTY AD-LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

WAYLAND THOMAS ISOM

ISSUE CITATION

DAWNA ELIZABETH DAVIS

ISSUE CITATION

SHARON DIJON PRICE

ISSUE CITATION

DARRYL LAWAYNE ISOM

ISSUE CITATION

RODRICK DAMON ISOM

ISSUE CITATION

TRAVIS ADRON ISOM II

ISSUE CITATION

OTHELLA ISOM

ISSUE CITATION

CITATION REQUEST

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 9

FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for T. A. ISOM A/K/A TRAVIS ADRON ISOM SR. : Transaction Assessment; ; $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2 - CBP - JJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: SUTHERLAND (AAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- WAYLAND DARWIN ISOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP T.A. ISOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for T. A. ISOM A/K/A TRAVIS ADRON ISOM SR. : Transaction Assessment; ; $72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 9-CIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for T. A. ISOM A/K/A TRAVIS ADRON ISOM SR. : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: T. A. ISOM A/K/A TRAVIS ADRON ISOM SR. ; Total Financial Assessment $438.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND is a litigant