This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 15:20:41 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. SHELLY WELLS INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A WELLS SERVICE STATION AND GROCERY et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against SHELLY WELLS INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A WELLS SERVICE STATION AND GROCERY. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1107

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

WELLS CONNER, ELLA MAE

WELLS, SHEILA

WELLS, DAVID

Desoto, TX 75115

WELLS, MICHAEL

Alpharetta, GA 30004

WELLS-BROWN, FRANCINE

Roswell, GA 30075

WELLS-MILTON, MICHELLE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

1100 Commerce Street, Third Floor

Dallas, TX 75242

SHELLY WELLS INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A WELLS SERVICE STATION AND GROCERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

SNELSON, TERESA GUERRA

 

Court Documents

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

COURT COST LETTER - FRANCINE WELLS-BROWN

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: COURT COST LETTER - FRANCINE WELLS-BROWN

COURT COST LETTER - MICHAEL WELLS

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: COURT COST LETTER - MICHAEL WELLS

EXEC - USA

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - USA

DAVID WELLS - UNEXECUTED CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - DAVID WELLS

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

EXECUTED CITATION - MICHAEL WELLS

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MICHAEL WELLS

EXECUTED CITATION - FRANCINE WELLS-BROWN

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - FRANCINE WELLS-BROWN

AFFIDAVIT FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

CBP - SHELLY WELLS, ELLA MAE WELLS CONNER, SHEILA WELLS, AND MICHELLE WELLS-MILTON

ISSUE CITATION

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: SNELSON (AAL)

CBP - MICHELLE WELLS-MILTON

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - MICHELLE WELLS-MILTON

CBP- SHEILA WELLS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - SHEILA WELLS

CBP - ELLA MAE WELLS CONNER

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - ELLA MAE WELLS CONNER

CBP - SHELLY WELLS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - SHELLY WELLS

PROPOSED O/APPT AAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO APPT ATTY AD LITEM

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Comment: TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: COURT COST LETTER - FRANCINE WELLS-BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: COURT COST LETTER - MICHAEL WELLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - USA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - DAVID WELLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - MICHAEL WELLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - FRANCINE WELLS-BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SHELLY WELLS INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A WELLS SERVICE STATION AND GROCERY : Transaction Assessment; ; $32.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 4 - CBP - JJ

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 09/15/2022; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Served; 08/12/2022: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2-TJRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG; Served: 08/10/2022; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Served; 08/10/2022: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2-SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2 SOS;2 CIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SHELLY WELLS INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A WELLS SERVICE STATION AND GROCERY : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SHELLY WELLS INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A WELLS SERVICE STATION AND GROCERY ; Total Financial Assessment $422.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY is a litigant