This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/04/2022 at 19:10:40 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. SHARI ANNE TRUSSELL et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against SHARI ANNE TRUSSELL. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1051

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

TRUSSELL, SHARI ANNE

TRUSSELL, KEITH BERRY

Hills, CA 91364-2551

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

JONES, STEPHEN E

 

Court Documents

REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -1

KEITH BERRY TRUSSELL - SOS CITATION

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Comment: MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

AFFIDAVIT CBP- SHARI ANNE TRUSSELL

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- SHARI ANNE TRUSSELL

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: STEPHEN JONES (AAL)

NONSIGNED ORDER - APPT ATTY AD-LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

AFFIDAVIT FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

ANSWER AD LITEM

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

CBP - SHARI ANNE TRUSSELL

ISSUE CITATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for TRUSSELL, SHARI ANNE : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 - CBP - JJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: STEPHEN JONES (AAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- SHARI ANNE TRUSSELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Comment: MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for TRUSSELL, SHARI ANNE : Transaction Assessment; ; $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 M/A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for TRUSSELL, SHARI ANNE : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: TRUSSELL, SHARI ANNE ; Total Financial Assessment $370.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT is a litigant