This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/18/2023 at 09:02:07 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. PAULINE WILLIAMS et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against PAULINE WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2054

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

WILLIAMS, PAULINE

FOLEY, LEROY

FOLEY, RENA

PAYNE, ADA

MARTLE, LENA J.

FOLEY, JESSIE

FOLEY, WILBOR

JEFFRIES, LEROY

FOLEY, CHARLES, Sr.

Tyler, TX 75703-8861

WOODS, DOROTHY

Tyler, TX 75701-2755

JACKSON, LILLIAN

Tyler, TX 75701-2707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

YATES, JEFFREY A

 

Court Documents

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

CBP - PAULINE WILLIAMS, ADA PAYNE, LENA MARTLE, LEROY, RENA, WILBOR FOLEY AND LEROY JEFFREIES

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 8 DEFENDANTS

UNEXEC - JACKSON, LILLIAN - CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - LILIAN JACKSON

EXECUTED CITATION - FOLEY, CHARLES, Sr.

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - CHARLES FOLEY SR.

UNEXECUTED CITATION - WOODS, DOROTHY

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - DOROTHY WOODS

ANSWER/AAL

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

CBP - 8 DEFENDANTS

ISSUE CITATION

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: YATES (AAL)

COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

FOR CIT BY POST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POST - LEROY JEFFRIES

FOR CIT BY POST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POST - WILBOR FOLEY

FOR CIT BY POST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POST - JESSIE FOLEY

FOR CIT BY POST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POST - LENA J MARTLE

FOR CIT BY POST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POST - ADA PAYNE

FOR CIT BY POST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POST - RENA FOLEY

FOR CIT BY POST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POST - LEROY FOLEY

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLIAMS, PAULINE : Transaction Assessment; ; $640.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 8 DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - LILIAN JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - CHARLES FOLEY SR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - DOROTHY WOODS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLIAMS, PAULINE : Transaction Assessment; ; $64.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Served: 03/06/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Served; 03/06/2023: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Served: 03/06/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Served; 03/06/2023: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Served: 03/06/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Served; 03/06/2023: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Served: 03/06/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Served; 03/06/2023: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 8 - CBP - JJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLIAMS, PAULINE : Transaction Assessment; ; $24.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 02/28/2023; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Return Unserved; 03/01/2023: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Served: 02/23/2023; Anticipated Server: ATTORNEY; Anticipated Method: Comment; 3 M/AS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLIAMS, PAULINE : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: WILLIAMS, PAULINE ; Total Financial Assessment $1,078.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION -3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less