This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 01/17/2023 at 16:48:35 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. PAULINE WILLIAMS et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against PAULINE WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1830

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

WILLIAMS, PAULINE

FOLEY, LEROY

PAYNE, ADA

MARTLE, LENA J.

FOLEY, JESSIE

FOLEY, WILBOR

JEFFRIES, LEROY

FOLEY, CHARLES, Sr.

Tyler, TX 75703-8861

WOODS, DOROTHY

Tyler, TX 75701-2755

JACKSON, LILLIAN

Tyler, TX 75701-2707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

MOMAN, MARIA C

 

Court Documents

REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

CBP - 7 DEFENDANTS

ISSUE CITATION

LILLIAN JACKSON

ISSUE CITATION

DOROTHY WOODS

ISSUE CITATION

CHARLES FOLEY SR.

ISSUE CITATION

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MOMAN (AAL)

AFFIDAVIT CBP - LERORY JEFFRIES

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- LEROY JEFFRIES

AFFIDAVIT CBP- WILBOR FOLEY

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- WILBOR FOLEY

AFFIDAVIT CBP- JESSIE FOLEY

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- JESSIE FOLEY

AFFIDAVIT CBP- LENA J MARTLE

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - LENA J MARTLE

AFFIDAVIT CBP- ADA PAYNE (IN REM ONLY)

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- ADA PAYNE

AFFIDAVIT CBP - LEROY FOLEY

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- LEROY FOLEY

AFFIDAVIT CBP- PAULINE WILLIAMS

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- PAULINE WILLIAMS

NONSIGNED ORDER - APPT AD-LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLIAMS, PAULINE : Transaction Assessment; ; $56.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 7 - CBP - JJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLIAMS, PAULINE : Transaction Assessment; ; $24.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 3-M/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MOMAN (AAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- LEROY FOLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- PAULINE WILLIAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for WILLIAMS, PAULINE : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: WILLIAMS, PAULINE ; Total Financial Assessment $430.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant