This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 01/17/2023 at 16:31:47 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. MILDRED ANN JONES et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MILDRED ANN JONES. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1822

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

JONES, MILDRED ANN

TUGGLE, CONNIE EDITH

Kaufman, TX 75142-6237

ISAACS, LARRY HAMPTON

Quitman, TX 75783-6243

ISAACS, WESLEY PRESTON

Mesquite, TX 75150-6235

MILLIGAN, JUDY MARIE

Point, TX 75169-6146

STATE OF TEXAS

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

LUCAS, DEASTINA G

 

Court Documents

REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 5 CITATIONS

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

CONNIE EDITH TUGGLE

ISSUE CITATION

LARRY HAMPTON ISAACS

ISSUE CITATION

WESLEY PRESTON ISAACS

ISSUE CITATION

JUDY MARIE MILLIGAN

ISSUE CITATION

STATE OF TEXAS

ISSUE CITATION

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

PROPOSED ORDER AD LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

FOR CIT BY POST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POST - MILDRED ANN JONES

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LUCAS (AAL)

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

CBP - MILDRED ANN JONES

ISSUE CITATION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JONES, MILDRED ANN : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 - CBP - JJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LUCAS (AAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR CIT BY POST - MILDRED ANN JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JONES, MILDRED ANN : Transaction Assessment; ; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 4 M/A; 1 TJRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 5 CITATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for JONES, MILDRED ANN : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: JONES, MILDRED ANN ; Total Financial Assessment $398.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant