This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/03/2022 at 19:22:18 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. MARILYN SUE BREWSTER et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MARILYN SUE BREWSTER. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1028

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

BREWSTER, MARILYN SUE

MOORE, CAROL JEAN

Dallas, TX 75209-5214

SMITH, RICKY R.

Dallas, TX 75203-1942

OWENS, ALVA L.

Dallas, TX 75209-5214

OWENS, KENNETH

Dallas, TX 75215-2473

OWENS, KATRINA

Mesquite, TX 75150-6026

OWENS, ANGELA

Dallas, TX 75287-5936

OWENS, ERICA

Carrollton, TX 75007-5743

OWENS, CLAYTON

Dallas, TX 75238-4089

OWENS, JUANITA

Crowley, TX 76036-3671

SIMMONS, LINDA

Garland, TX 75040

THE STATE OF TEXAS

Austin, TX 78701

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA, N.A.

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

JONES, STEPHEN E

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL ANSWER -GENERAL DENIAL

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

AFFIDAVIT FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: STEPHEN JONES (AAL)

CBP - MARILYN SUE BREWSTER

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - MARILYN SUE BREWSTER

PROPOSED O/APPT AAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO APPT AAL

ALVA L OWENS

ISSUE CITATION

RICKY R SMITH

ISSUE CITATION

CAROL JEAN MOORE

ISSUE CITATION

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA

ISSUE CITATION

STATE OF TEXAS

ISSUE CITATION

LINDA SIMMONS - 304 JOYCE DRIVE

ISSUE CITATION

CLAYTON OWENS

ISSUE CITATION

ERICA OWENS

ISSUE CITATION

ANGELA OWENS

ISSUE CITATION

DAL ISSUANCE REQUEST

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 13

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: TAX REAL PROPERTY

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BREWSTER, MARILYN SUE : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Unserved: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 - CBP - JJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: STEPHEN JONES (AAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - MARILYN SUE BREWSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED ORDER TO APPT AAL

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 7-CIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 6-CIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BREWSTER, MARILYN SUE : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: BREWSTER, MARILYN SUE ; Total Financial Assessment $462.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: TAX REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant