This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/10/2022 at 19:15:30 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. LUIS C. SANDOVAL et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LUIS C SANDOVAL. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1032

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

SANDOVAL, LUIS C.

Dallas, TX 75216-6434

PREOWNED HOMES, LLC

5462 Cr 281

Kaufman, TX 75142

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

CITATION REQUEST

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

LUIS C SANDOVAL

ISSUE CITATION

PREOWNED HOMES LLC

ISSUE CITATION

AFFIDAVIT FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SANDOVAL, LUIS C. : Transaction Assessment; ; $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2-CIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SANDOVAL, LUIS C. : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: SANDOVAL, LUIS C. ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant