This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 09/25/2022 at 04:27:11 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY, et al vs. LITHIUM WERKS, INC., ALSO KNOWN AS LITHIUM WERKS

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LITHIUM WERKS, INC , ALSO KNOWN AS LITHIUM WERKS. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1121

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

COPPELL INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF COPPELL

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Defendants

LITHIUM WERKS, INC., ALSO KNOWN AS LITHIUM WERKS

WERKS INC., LITHIUM

921 W Bethel Rd.

Coppell, TX 75019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNIGHTON, SHERREL

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

COVER LETTER

CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: COVER LETTER

PROPOSED TAX WARRANT AND RETURN

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TAX WARRANT AND RETURN

ORDER - TAX WARRANT

ORDER - TAX WARRANT

EXEC TAX WARRANT

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED TAX WARRANT

NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type; NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

MOTION FOR DISMISSAL

MOTION - DISMISS

PRPOSED ORDER AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL OF TAX WARRANT

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PRPOSED ORDER AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL OF TAX WARRANT

NOTICE OF OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES

MISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Judgment Type: NON-SUIT/DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF / PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: NOTICE OF OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PRPOSED ORDER AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL OF TAX WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for LITHIUM WERKS, INC., ALSO KNOWN AS LITHIUM WERKS : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 55317-2022-DCLK; CHERYL LOGAN $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED TAX WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for LITHIUM WERKS, INC., ALSO KNOWN AS LITHIUM WERKS : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: LITHIUM WERKS, INC., ALSO KNOWN AS LITHIUM WERKS ; Total Financial Assessment $350.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TAX WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: PROPOSED TAX WARRANT AND RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE; Comment: COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: APPLICATION FOR TAX WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COPPELL INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND is a litigant

Latest cases where PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT is a litigant