This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 02/25/2023 at 06:11:06 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. LARRY W. MCCULLOUGH

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against LARRY W MCCULLOUGH. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2058

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendant

MCCULLOUGH, LARRY W.

Shreveport, LA 71105-5407

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 1 CITATION

LARRY W MCCULLOUGH

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

COST OF ABST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for MCCULLOUGH, LARRY W. : Transaction Assessment; ; $12.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 M/A, SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 1 CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for MCCULLOUGH, LARRY W. : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: MCCULLOUGH, LARRY W. ; Total Financial Assessment $362.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less