This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 02/25/2023 at 06:11:15 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. JOSE JUAN CAUDILLO et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JOSE JUAN CAUDILLO. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2059

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

CAUDILLO, JOSE JUAN

Dallas, TX 75241-4709

SILVA, YOLANDA

Dallas, TX 75241-4709

TAYLOR, DERRICK

Italy, TX 75115-3940

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

1100 Commerce Street, Third Floor

Dallas, TX 75242

JOHNSON, VERNON L.

Dallas, TX 75241-5713

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION -5

JOSE JUAN CAUDILLO - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

YOLANDA SILVA - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

DEERRICK TAYLOR - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

THE USA-IRS -CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

VERNON L. JOHNSON - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

COST OF ABST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAUDILLO, JOSE JUAN : PAYMENT (CASE FEES); Receipt # 5273-2023-DCLK; SILVA, YOLANDA $1150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAUDILLO, JOSE JUAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 5 TJRCS & 1M/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION -5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAUDILLO, JOSE JUAN : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: CAUDILLO, JOSE JUAN ; Total Financial Assessment $390.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $1,150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less