This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 01/17/2023 at 16:49:00 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. JOAN FAYE DEAN et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JOAN FAYE DEAN. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1833

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

DEAN, JOAN FAYE

DEAN, JOSEPH RANDALL

Dallas, TX 75217-3343

MONICA ANN DEAN A/K/A MONICA WEST

3209 Westshore Drive

Rowlett, TX 75088-1573

ROBIN ELIZABETH DEAN A/K/A ROBIN JETER

115 Overhill Dr

Waxahachie, TX 75165

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

ADEYEMI, ADESOLA

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial JOSEPH

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: JOSEPH RANDALL DEAN

Non Jury Trial MONICA

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MONICA ANN DEAN A/K/A MONICA WEST

Non Jury Trial ROBIN

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: ROBIN ELIZABETH DEAN A/K/A ROBIN JETER

JOSEPH RANDALL DEAN EXEC

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - JOSEPH RANDALL DEAN

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL - JOSEPH RANDALL DEAN

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL - MONICA DEAN WEST

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL - ROBIN E D JETER

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

ANSWER AD LITEM

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

CBP- JOAN FAYE DEAN

ISSUE CITATION

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: ADEYEMI (AAL)

AFFIDAVIT CBP- JOAN FAY DEAN

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP- JOAN FAYE DEAN

NONSIGNED ORDER - APPT ATTY AD-LITEM

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER APPOINTING ATTY AD LITEM

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

AFFIDAVIT COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: COST OF ABSTRACT-TEXS

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: JOSEPH RANDALL DEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: MONICA ANN DEAN A/K/A MONICA WEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: ROBIN ELIZABETH DEAN A/K/A ROBIN JETER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - JOSEPH RANDALL DEAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for DEAN, JOAN FAYE : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: COST OF ABSTRACT-TEXS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for DEAN, JOAN FAYE : Transaction Assessment; ; $24.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Served: 12/20/2022; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Comment; 2 TJRCS & 1 M/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for DEAN, JOAN FAYE : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: DEAN, JOAN FAYE ; Total Financial Assessment $382.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant