This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/16/2023 at 16:46:52 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. IRON CACTUS DALLAS, L.P.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against IRON CACTUS DALLAS, L P. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0318

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendant

IRON CACTUS DALLAS, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - PERSONAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 1

IRON CACTUS DALLAS LP

ISSUE CITATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for IRON CACTUS DALLAS, L.P. : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1-M/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for IRON CACTUS DALLAS, L.P. : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: IRON CACTUS DALLAS, L.P. ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - PERSONAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less