This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/05/2023 at 02:01:05 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. CONNIE JARRETT SOULES, JR. A/K/A C. J. SOULES, JR. et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CONNIE JARRETT SOULES, JR A/K/A C J SOULES, JR. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0339

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

SOULES, EUGENIA

SOULES, SAMUEL LEE

SOULES, RONALD JARRET

SOULES, BRYAN J.

SOULES, BELINDA KAY

CONNIE JARRETT SOULES, JR. A/K/A C. J. SOULES, JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

GRANSBERRY, NATASHA L

 

Court Documents

BELINDA KAY SOULES - UNEXECUTED CITATION

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION BELINDA KAY SOULES

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER, GRANSBERRY, BRYAN J. SOULES

Non Jury Trial AAL

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER, GRANSBERRY, BRYAN J. SOULES

Non Jury Trial LGBS

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER, GRANSBERRY, BRYAN J. SOULES

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL - BRYAN J. SOULES

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 3 DEFENDANTS

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 3 DEFENDANTS

UNEXECUTED CITATION - RONALD JARRET SOULES

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - RONALD JARRET SOULES

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: GRANSBERRY (AAL)

PROPOSED O/APPT AAL

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: TO APPOINT ATTY AD LITEM

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Comment: TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

BELINDA KAY SOULES

ISSUE CITATION

BRYAN J SOULES

ISSUE CITATION

RONALD JARRET SOULES

ISSUE CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 3 CITATIONS

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

- REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:45 AM; Comment: MEETING ID 848 9467 4902

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM; Cancel Reason: HEARING RESCHEDULED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION BELINDA KAY SOULES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER, GRANSBERRY, BRYAN J. SOULES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 3 DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - RONALD JARRET SOULES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERVENTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCITATION BY POSTING; Served: 04/24/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Served; 04/24/2023: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 1: Anticipated Method; Served: 04/24/2023; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 1; Anticipated Method: Comment; 3 - CBP - JJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CBP - CONNIE JARETT SOULES, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: TO APPOINT ATTY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Comment: TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Served: 03/23/2023; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Unserved; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Return Unserved; 05/09/2023: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 3 TJRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 3 CITATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less