This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/01/2023 at 13:37:09 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. CLARICE TURNER A/K/A CLARICE HEMPHILL, et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CLARICE TURNER A/K/A CLARICE HEMPHILL,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0334

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF DALLAS

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COLLEGE

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendants

TURNER, FRUDA MAE

TURNER, ELACIE

ROBINSON, LUERECE

BERNIS MAE TURNER A/K/A BERNIS MAE MCNAC

CLARICE TURNER A/K/A CLARICE HEMPHILL

WINNIE RUTH TURNER A/K/A WINNIE SHAW A/K/A WINNIE DIXON

ERVIE MAE TURNER A/K/A ERVIE SELLARS A/K/A ERVIE GOODSPEED

HINES, TRUDIE JEAN

HEMPHILL, DONALD CHARLES

HEMPHILL, RONALD RAY

HEMPHILL, MICHAEL ANDREW

MARTHA ANN HEMPHILL A/K/A MARTHA REID

MCNAC, KATHERINE

TURNER, ERVIN

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

Defendant Attorney

BALDERSON, JACK, Jr

 

Court Documents

EXECUTED SOS CITATION - JOSEPHH EL HEMPHILL

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - JOSEPHH EL HEMPHILL

EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 9 DEFENDANTS

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 9 DEFENDANTS

DWIGHT O'BRYAN MCNAC

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

JOSEPH EL HAMPHILL

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

CALVIN ERVIN MCNAC

ISSUE CITATION

BELINDA CHERYL MCNAC

ISSUE CITATION

CLARENCE ROBINSON JR

ISSUE CITATION

MARTHA ANN HEMPHILL

ISSUE CITATION

MICHAEL ANDREW HEMPHILL

ISSUE CITATION

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: BALDERSON (AAL)

JOSEPH EL HEMPHILL

ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 10 CITATIONS

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -3

THE USA -IRS - CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -3

KORNELIUS RYAN MORGAN SOS - CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -3

KADIZSHA REBECCA MORGAN SOS CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -3

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

- REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED SOS CITATION - JOSEPHH EL HEMPHILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for CLARICE TURNER A/K/A CLARICE HEMPHILL : Transaction Assessment; ; $720.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION BY POSTING - 9 DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for CLARICE TURNER A/K/A CLARICE HEMPHILL : Transaction Assessment; ; $88.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketCITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2 M/A, SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 6 TJRC; 2 M/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 10 CITATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 10 CITATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for CLARICE TURNER A/K/A CLARICE HEMPHILL : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: CLARICE TURNER A/K/A CLARICE HEMPHILL ; Total Financial Assessment $1,346.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less