This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 08/02/2022 at 22:15:15 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. CHARLES HOUSTON TALLENT, III et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CHARLES HOUSTON TALLENT, III. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0958

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

TALLENT, CHARLES HOUSTON, III

Garland, TX 75040-3751

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

1100 Commerce Street, Third Floor

Dallas, TX 75242

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

CITATION REQUEST

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

CHARLES HOUSTON TALLENT III

ISSUE CITATION

USA

ISSUE CITATION

AFFIDAVIT FOR COSTS OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: COSTS OF ABSTRACT -TEKS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: COSTS OF ABSTRACT -TEKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for TALLENT, CHARLES HOUSTON, III : Transaction Assessment; ; $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 2-TJRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: CITATION 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for TALLENT, CHARLES HOUSTON, III : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: TALLENT, CHARLES HOUSTON, III ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND is a litigant