This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 03/24/2023 at 23:02:01 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. CARLYN BAILEY-MASON et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CARLYN BAILEY-MASON. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0157

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF DALLAS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COLLEGE

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

BAILEY-MASON, CARLYN

Dallas, TX 75204-2206

FIRST BANK, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HUNTINGTON NATIONAL BANK AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAROLD MASON INCOME TRUST

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

MASON, TYLER-MAKAI HAROLD-NICHOLAS

Houston, TX 77019-4816

MASON, BAILEY-SIAMONE ADAMMA-MARIE

Dallas, TX 75203-4525

GRAYSON, JOHNNIE MAE

Dallas, TX 75232

GARZA PROPERTIES LLC

2515A Nasa Parkway #2

Seabrook, TX 77586

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

- REAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -6

CARLYN BAILEY - MASON -CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

FIRST BANK N.A. CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

TYLER -MAKAI HAROLD -NICHOLAS MASON - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

BAILEY -SIAMONE ADAMMA -MARIE MASON - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

JONNIE MAE GRAYSIN - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

GARZA PROPERTIES LLC - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

UNEXECUTED CITATION - BAILEY-SIAMONE ADAMMA-MARIE MASON

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - BAILEY-SIAMONE ADAMMA-MARIE MASON

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - BAILEY-SIAMONE ADAMMA-MARIE MASON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for BAILEY-MASON, CARLYN : Transaction Assessment; ; $48.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Return Unserved: 03/23/2023; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Comment; 4 TJRCS & 2 TJRCS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATIONS -6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for BAILEY-MASON, CARLYN : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial: BAILEY-MASON, CARLYN ; Total Financial Assessment $398.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less