This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 02/25/2023 at 06:11:31 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. AUDREY KENNEDY et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against AUDREY KENNEDY. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2061

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF WILMER

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendants

KENNEDY, AUDREY

Dallas, TX 75232-3713

PRYOR, DEZZARRAY

Duncanville, TX 75116-4829

TIFFANY REYNOLDS D/B/A SQAMA INVESTMENTS

4810 Spur 408 Apt. 623

Dallas, TX 75236-3201

JOHNSON, JORDAN

Wilmer, TX 75172-1523

THE STATE OF TEXAS

Austin, TX 78774

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINS, ASHLY STEELE

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -6

AUDREY KENNEDY - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

DEZARRAY PRYOR - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

TIFFANY REYNOLDS - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

JORDAN JOHNSON - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

THE STATE OF TEXAS - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC -CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

COST OF ABST

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for KENNEDY, AUDREY : Transaction Assessment; ; $48.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 4 TJRCS & 2 MA/S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for KENNEDY, AUDREY : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: KENNEDY, AUDREY ; Total Financial Assessment $398.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less