This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 06/01/2023 at 12:02:02 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. ARTURO L. GARCIA

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ARTURO L GARCIA. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2053

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

GRAND PRAIRIE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF GRAND PRAIRIE

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

Defendant

GARCIA, ARTURO L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ, EDWARD, Jr

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

ARTURO L. GARCIA -CITATION

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION-1

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION-1

COST OF ABSTRACT

AFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

MOTION - CONTINUANCE

NONSIGNED ORDER CONTINUANCE

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER CONTINUANCE

MOTION FOR RULE 106 SERVICE

MOTION-SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: FOR RULE 106 SERVICE - ARTURO L. GARCIA

NONSIGNED ORDER RULE 106 SERVICE -ARTURO L. GARCIA

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER RULE 106 SERVICE - ARTURO L. GARCIA

ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: R-106 SERVICE - ARTURO L GARCIA

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 1 CITATION

ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE

ARTURO L GARCIA

ISSUE CITATION

UNEXECUTED CITATION - ARTURO L. GARCIA

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - ARTURO L. GARCIA

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM; Cancel Reason: HEARING RESCHEDULED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: UNEXECUTED CITATION - ARTURO L. GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for GARCIA, ARTURO L. : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 TJRC, R106

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: 1 CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: R-106 SERVICE - ARTURO L GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: FOR COST OF ABSTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for GARCIA, ARTURO L. : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCITATION; Return Unserved: 05/02/2023; Anticipated Server: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER; Anticipated Method: Comment; 1 TJRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GARCIA, ARTURO L. : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: GARCIA, ARTURO L. ; Total Financial Assessment $366.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: - REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less