This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 01/17/2023 at 16:32:30 (UTC).

DALLAS COUNTY et al vs. ALL STAR MACHINE AND WELDING, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 DALLAS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ALL STAR MACHINE AND WELDING, INC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GINSBERG, CARL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1827

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GINSBERG, CARL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DALLAS COUNTY

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

CITY OF BALCH SPRINGS

Dallas, TX 75207

PARKLAND HOSPITAL DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND

2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendant

ALL STAR MACHINE AND WELDING, INC.

3211 Peachtree Road, Suite 131

Springs, TX 75180

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEARDEN, DANIEL K., Jr

 

Court Documents

PERSONAL PROPERTY

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PERSONAL PROPERTY

Non Jury Trial

NOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -1

ALL STAR MACHINE AND WELDING INC - CITATION

ISSUE CITATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: GINSBERG, CARL; Hearing Time: 10:05 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ALL STAR MACHINE AND WELDING, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Anticipated Method; Comment: 1 TJRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUE CITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL; Comment: LINEBARGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE; Comment: ISSUE CITATION -1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ALL STAR MACHINE AND WELDING, INC. : Transaction Assessment; ; $350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial: ALL STAR MACHINE AND WELDING, INC. ; Total Financial Assessment $358.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PERSONAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY SCHOOL EQUALIZATION FUND is a litigant

Latest cases where DALLAS COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant